EP0097995 - Process for imparting antimicrobial properties to materials and materials treated by the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Buckeye Cellulose Corporation 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | For all designated states The Buckeye Cellulose Corporation 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harvey, Susan Leigh 594 S. Prescott Memphis Tennessee 38111 / US | 02 /
Cresswell, James Larry 2946 Mountain Terrace Memphis Tennessee 38127 / US | 03 /
Huff, Byron Jerry Lee 2248 Holly Grove Drive Memphis Tennessee 38119 / US | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Tony Nicholas, et al Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | Gibson, Tony Nicholas, et al Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 83200890.8 | 17.06.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | US19820392193 | 25.06.1982 Original published format: US 392193 | [1984/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0097995 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0097995 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/03, A01N37/06 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
A01N37/02 (EP,US);
A01N37/06 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2221 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2525 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/02, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N37/06, A01N2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verleihen von antimikrobiellen Eigenschaften an Materialien und durch dieses Verfahren behandelte Materialien | [1984/02] | English: | Process for imparting antimicrobial properties to materials and materials treated by the process | [1984/02] | French: | Procédé pour donner des propriétés microbicides à des matériaux et matériaux traités par ce procédé | [1984/02] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 04.07.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3521624 (GANDER ROBERT J, et al); | [AD]US4113911 (LAFITTE LARRY L, et al); | [AD]EP0022289 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |