EP0097997 - Method of generating a pseudo-random sequence of signs of a large sequence length [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1988 [1988/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Ende, Antonius Cornelis Johannes c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | van Schaik, Johannes Wilhelmus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | Van Schaik, Johannes Wilhelmus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1984/02] | Hanneman, Henri Willem Andries Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 83200895.7 | 20.06.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | NL19820002547 | 23.06.1982 Original published format: NL 8202547 | [1984/02] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0097997 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0097997 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0097997 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/04 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
G06F7/582 (EP,US);
G06F7/586 (EP,US);
H04L9/0662 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung einer Pseudo-Zufallsfolge von Zeichen mit einer grossen Folgenlänge | [1984/02] | English: | Method of generating a pseudo-random sequence of signs of a large sequence length | [1984/02] | French: | Procédé de génération d'une séquence pseudo-aléatoire de signes avec une grande longueur de séquence | [1984/02] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 12.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2547937 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]US3838259 (KORTENHAUS D); | [A]DD978059 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 14, no. 10, March 1972, pages 2978-2979, New York, USA; R.O. SKATRUD: "Random-key generator for ciphering system" |