EP0098660 - Watch glass made from mineral material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hans Stettler AG Bürenstrasse, 24 CH-3250 Lyss / CH | [1984/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soder, Robert rue de Veraye, 4 CH-1820 Montreux / CH | 02 /
Stettler, Erich Oberfeldweg 12 CH-3250 Lyss / CH | [1984/03] | Representative(s) | Meylan, Robert Maurice, et al c/o Bugnion SA Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | Meylan, Robert Maurice, et al c/o Bugnion SA Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 CH-1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH | Application number, filing date | 83200985.6 | 01.07.1983 | [1984/03] | Priority number, date | CH19820004138 | 07.07.1982 Original published format: CH 413882 | [1984/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098660 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G04B39/00 | [1984/03] | CPC: |
G04B39/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/03] | Title | German: | Uhrglas aus mineralischem Material | [1984/03] | English: | Watch glass made from mineral material | [1984/03] | French: | Glace de montre en matière minérale | [1984/03] | File destroyed: | 08.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 05.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/21] | 02.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/25] | 13.12.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]CH622151 (KLINGENBERG HANS ULRICH [CH]); | [A]CH10279 (THALMANN J WILH [CH]); | [A]GB1338629 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK); | [A]DE3040493 (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO [US]) | [X] - REVUE EUROPEENE DE L'HORLOGERIE-BIJOUTERIE, no. 3, juillet 1980, page 78 |