EP0099613 - Method for the prevention of arcing in a spark erosion process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stichting Steunfonds Laboratorium voor werkplaatstechniek en Organisatie van de Technische Hogeschool Delft Landbergstraat 3 2628 CE Delft / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | For all designated states Stichting Steunfonds Laboratorium voor werkplaatstechniek en Organisatie van de Technische Hogeschool Delft Landbergstraat 3 NL-2628 CE Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Bruyn, Hendrik Elias Mijnbouwstraat 16 NL-2628 RW Delft / NL | [1984/05] | Representative(s) | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir., et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 83201082.1 | 21.07.1983 | [1984/05] | Priority number, date | NL19820002964 | 22.07.1982 Original published format: NL 8202964 | [1984/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0099613 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099613 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B23H1/02 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
B23H1/024 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/05] | B23P1/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verhindern von Lichtbögen beim Funkenerosionsprozess | [1984/05] | English: | Method for the prevention of arcing in a spark erosion process | [1984/05] | French: | Méthode pour la prévention d'arcs dans un processus d'électroérosion | [1984/05] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/40] | 17.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.10.1986 | SE | 31.10.1986 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/16] | SE | 31.10.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2210482 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [X]FR2164358 (PHILIPS NV) |