blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0105541

EP0105541 - A DC-to-AC voltage converter having galvanically separated input and output(s) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.01.1990
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP
Oude Winterswijkseweg 7
NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL
[N/P]
Former [1984/16]For all designated states
N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP
Oude Winterswijkseweg 7
NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Hoeksma, Gerben Simon
Bargerkempke 5
NL-7103 DX Winterswijk / NL
[1984/16]
Representative(s)Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al
Vereenigde Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1989/15]Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
Former [1984/16]Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir.
c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107
NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL
Application number, filing date83201258.701.09.1983
[1984/16]
Priority number, dateNL1982000347406.09.1982         Original published format: NL 8203474
[1984/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0105541
Date:18.04.1984
Language:EN
[1984/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0105541
Date:05.02.1986
Language:EN
[1986/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0105541
Date:01.03.1989
Language:EN
[1989/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.1985
ClassificationIPC:H02M7/537
[1984/16]
CPC:
H02M7/539 (EP,US); H02M3/33523 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1984/16]
TitleGerman:Umrichter von Gleich- in Wechselspannung mit galvanisch getrenntem Ein- und Ausgang[1984/16]
English:A DC-to-AC voltage converter having galvanically separated input and output(s)[1984/16]
French:Convertisseur de tension continu-alternatif ayant une entrée et une sortie séparée galvaniquement[1984/16]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure17.01.1986Examination requested  [1986/12]
28.10.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.1988Fee for grant paid
19.10.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.1988Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT01.03.1989
[1999/42]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2536207  (SIEMENS AG);
 [A]GB1485709  (DENKI ONKYO CO LTD, et al);
 [AP]DE3219964  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE])
ExaminationEP0043761
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.