EP0108438 - Process for the conversion of hydrocarbon oils [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.1987 [1987/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janssen, Martinus Maria Petrus Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Van der Linde, Berend Jacob Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
Maxwell, Ian Ernest Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 04 /
Pott, Gerard Tjarko Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1984/20] | Puister, Antonius Tonnis, Mr. P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 83201477.3 | 14.10.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | GB19820031167 | 01.11.1982 Original published format: GB 8231167 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108438 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108438 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C10G47/20 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
B01J23/888 (EP);
C10G47/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Umwandlung von Kohlenwasserstoffölen | [1984/20] | English: | Process for the conversion of hydrocarbon oils | [1984/20] | French: | Procédé de conversion d'huiles hydrocarbonées | [1984/20] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 24.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4330395 [ ] (POTT GERARD T, et al); | GB1390359 [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | GB1493620 [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH) | by applicant | GB1493620 | GB1390359 |