EP0110469 - X-ray analysis apparatus comprising a four-crystal monochromator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartels, Willem Jan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Scheele, Edial François, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Scheele, Edial François, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 83201641.4 | 17.11.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | NL19820004584 | 25.11.1982 Original published format: NL 8204584 | [1984/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0110469 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0110469 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110469 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/207, G21K1/06 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
G01N23/2076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/24] | Title | German: | Apparat zur Röntgenstrahlenanalyse, mit einem Vierkristallmonochromator | [1984/24] | English: | X-ray analysis apparatus comprising a four-crystal monochromator | [1984/24] | French: | Appareil pour l'analyse par rayons X comportant un monochromateur à quatre cristaux | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 17.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 01.02.1989 | [1990/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED CRYST., vol. 7, 1974, pages 254-259, DK; T. MATSUSHITA: "A method of obtaining a highly parallel and monochromatic X-ray beam by successive diffraction" | [Y] - PHYSICAL REVIEW, vol. 52, October 15, 1937, pages 872-879, New York, US; J.W.M. DUMOND: "Theory of the use of more than two successive X-ray crystal reflections to obtain increased resolving power" |