EP0110485 - Method for manufacturing a container for storing and transporting waste material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/24] | Container for waste, method and device for manufacturing such a container and cover for such a container | ||
[1987/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.1988 [1988/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mako B.V. Bosscherweg 250 NL-6219 AC Maastricht / NL | [1984/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van de Camp, Johannes Wilhelmus Appellaan 9 NL-6241 AP Bunde / NL | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, et al World Trade Center, P. Petersstraat 160 5612 LV Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, Ir., et al World Trade Center, P. Petersstraat 160 NL-5612 LV Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 83201718.0 | 05.12.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | NL19820004725 | 07.12.1982 Original published format: NL 8204725 | [1984/24] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0110485 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110485 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B65D3/06 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
B65D43/0212 (EP);
B65D21/022 (EP);
B65D3/06 (EP);
B65D2543/00092 (EP);
B65D2543/00296 (EP);
B65D2543/00416 (EP);
B65D2543/00518 (EP);
B65D2543/00537 (EP);
B65D2543/00555 (EP);
B65D2543/00564 (EP);
B65D2543/00629 (EP);
B65D2543/00685 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Abfallbehälter | [1987/13] | English: | Method for manufacturing a container for storing and transporting waste material | [1987/13] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un récipient pour stocker et transporter des ordures | [1987/13] |
Former [1984/24] | Abfallbehälter, Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu seiner Herstellung; Deckel für denselben | ||
Former [1984/24] | Container for waste, method and device for manufacturing such a container and cover for such a container | ||
Former [1984/24] | Récipient à ordures, procédé et dispositif pour sa fabrication; couvercle pour un tel récipient | Examination procedure | 03.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/37] | 04.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2255444 (BLANCHARD MILTON J); | [A]US3215325 (LEE SHAPPELL RICHARD, et al); | [A]FR1439043 (SONOCO PRODUCTS); | [A]GB1078326 (ROBERT GEORGES EUGENE DURAT); | [Y]US3428239 (WANNAMAKER THOMAS M, et al); | [A]FR2146957 (LEVI HENRI); | [A]FR2281831 (ZIRISTOR AB [SE]); | [Y]NL7806030 (LINGNER & FISCHER GMBH); | [YD]WO8100081 (INLANDS AB [SE], et al); | [Y]GB2059400 (METAL BOX CO LTD) |