EP0119329 - Treatment of milk products with lactic acid bacteria and lactose-splitting enzymes, and use of the resulting products in preparing foodstuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1984/39] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lelieveld, Hubertus L.M. Spechtstraat 110 NL-3145 XM Maassluis / NL | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | van der Toorren, Johannes, et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | van der Toorren, Johannes, Drs., et al UNILEVER N.V. Patent Division Postbus 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 83201827.9 | 21.12.1983 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | NL19820005012 | 28.12.1982 Original published format: NL 8205012 | [1984/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0119329 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/12, A23C15/12, A23D3/00 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
A23C9/1275 (EP);
A23C9/1206 (EP);
A23C2220/104 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/39] | Title | German: | Behandlung von Milchprodukten mit Milchsäurebakterien und Laktose spaltende Enzyme und Verwendung der resultierenden Produkte für die Herstellung von Nahrungsmitteln | [1984/39] | English: | Treatment of milk products with lactic acid bacteria and lactose-splitting enzymes, and use of the resulting products in preparing foodstuffs | [1984/39] | French: | Traitement de produits laitiers avec des bactéries d'acide lactique et des enzymes lysant le lactose, et utilisation des produits obtenus dans la préparation de produits alimentaires | [1984/39] | File destroyed: | 03.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 30.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/46] | 16.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/46] | 04.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2409010 ; | [A]DE2853157 ; | [A]FR2406393 | [Y] - ANNALES DE LA NUTRITION ET DE L'ALIMENTATION, vol. 32, 1978, pages 657-669; | [YD] - PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 11, no. 5, June 1976, pages 39-40; | [Y] - J.MILK FOOD TECHNOLOGY, vol. 36, no. 1, 1973, pages 31-33; | [Y] - FERMENTED FRESH MILK PRODUCTS, vol. 1, 1978, pages 101,310-318, Technical Dairy Publ. House, Copenhagen (DK); | [AD] - CULTURED DAIRY PRODUCTS JOURNAL, vol. 17, no. 2, May 1982, pages 18,19,22; |