EP0092893 - Fender [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE TIRE COMPANY LIMITED 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/44] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE TIRE COMPANY LIMITED 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kajigaya, Shinichi 7-26, Konan 1-chome Konan-Ku Yokohama City / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Ikutoshi 27-104, Shimomachiya 1-Chome Chigasaki City / JP | [1983/44] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/44] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300088.8 | 07.01.1983 | [1983/44] | Priority number, date | JP19820070230 | 28.04.1982 Original published format: JP 7023082 | [1983/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092893 | Date: | 02.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092893 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | E02B3/22, F16F1/36, B63B59/02 | [1983/44] | CPC: |
B63B59/02 (EP);
E02B3/26 (EP);
F16F1/422 (EP);
F16F2236/02 (EP);
Y02A30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/44] | Title | German: | Fender | [1983/44] | English: | Fender | [1983/44] | French: | Pare-choc marin | [1983/44] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/21] | 07.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2032050 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [Y]GB1197534 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE KABUSHIKI KTI [JP]); | [A]FR2339022 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]); | [A]DE2856201 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [A]DE2524886 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD); | [A]DE2133380 (SEIBU GOMU KAGAKU KK) |