EP0087279 - Method of repairing turbine blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REFURBISHED TURBINE COMPONENTS LIMITED George Bayliss Road Droitwich Hereford and Worcester WR9 9AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | For all designated states REFURBISHED TURBINE COMPONENTS LIMITED George Bayliss Road Droitwich Hereford and Worcester WR9 9AB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fraser, Michael James Dale Cross Grange Mearse Lane Barnt Green Birmingham / GB | [1983/35] | Representative(s) | Symes, Robert G., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | Symes, Robert George, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83300828.7 | 18.02.1983 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | GB19820005078 | 20.02.1982 Original published format: GB 8205078 | [1983/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087279 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087279 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087279 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B23P6/04 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
B23P6/007 (EP);
F01D5/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Reparieren einer Turbinenschaufel | [1983/35] | English: | Method of repairing turbine blade | [1983/35] | French: | Méthode de réparation d'une aube de turbine | [1983/35] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/06] | 08.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.11.1987 | [1989/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3449816 (SWICK DWAIN K, et al); | [A]US3576065 (FRAZIER LORNE L); | [A]DE2054549 (NORTH AMERICAN ROCKWELL); | [XP]EP0056328 (REFURBISHED TURBINE COMPONENTS [GB]) |