EP0087895 - A ball bearing puller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Denmeade, Robert George Lot 21 Old Pitt Town Road Box Hill New South Wales / AU | For all designated states Denmeade, James Gerald 30 Hopman Street Greystanes New South Wales / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states Denmeade, Robert George Lot 21 Old Pitt Town Road Box Hill New South Wales / AU | ||
For all designated states Denmeade, James Gerald 30 Hopman Street Greystanes New South Wales / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | King, Bertram Thomas KINGS PATENT AGENCY LIMITED 73 Farringdon Road London EC1M 3JB / GB | [1983/36] | Application number, filing date | 83300843.6 | 18.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | AU19820002896 | 01.03.1982 Original published format: AU 289682 | AU19820005788 | 08.09.1982 Original published format: AU 578882 | [1983/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087895 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087895 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087895 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/06 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
B25B27/062 (EP,US);
F16C35/062 (EP,US);
F16C19/06 (EP);
Y10T29/53861 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/36] | Title | German: | Extraktor für Kugellager | [1983/36] | English: | A ball bearing puller | [1983/36] | French: | Extracteur de bagues de roulement | [1983/36] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/12] | 10.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.07.1987 | IT | 29.07.1987 | NL | 29.07.1987 | SE | 31.07.1987 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 29.07.1987 | |
IT | 29.07.1987 | ||
NL | 29.07.1987 | ||
SE | 31.07.1987 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 29.07.1987 | |
NL | 29.07.1987 | ||
SE | 31.07.1987 | ||
Former [1989/19] | AT | 29.07.1987 | |
NL | 29.07.1987 | ||
SE | 31.07.1987 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 29.07.1987 | |
NL | 29.07.1987 | ||
Former [1989/04] | NL | 29.07.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3605242 (KUFFNER OTTO E); | [Y]DE875329 (OESCH HANS); | [YD]US4034458 (FORD WILLIAM R, et al); | [A]GB672390 (ALBERT SCHREM); | [A]US1670573 (HOWELL JAMES W) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 19, no. 10, March 1977, page 3856, New York, US |