EP0087914 - Detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.07.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati, OH 45201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bleil, Charles F. 5987 Gilmore Drive Fairfield Ohio 45014 / US | 02 /
Welch, John B., III 308 Forest Avenue Wyoming Ohio 45215 / US | 03 /
Gilbert, Lawrence A. 1596 Congress Hill Lane Fairfield Ohio 45014 / US | 04 /
Yam, Benny S. 8770 Wildbrook Court West Chester Ohio 45069 / US | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Tony Nicholas, et al Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Gibson, Tony Nicholas, et al Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300931.9 | 23.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | US19820353743 | 01.03.1982 Original published format: US 353743 | US19820380987 | 24.05.1982 Original published format: US 380987 | US19830465211 | 15.02.1983 Original published format: US 465211 | [1986/48] |
Former [1983/36] | US19820353743 | 01.03.1982 | |
US19830465211 | 15.02.1983 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0087914 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087914 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/65, C11D1/12, C11D1/38, C11D1/40 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
C11D1/40 (EP);
C11D1/60 (EP);
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D1/65 (EP);
C11D1/86 (EP);
C11D1/14 (EP);
C11D1/22 (EP);
C11D1/28 (EP);
C11D1/29 (EP);
C11D1/42 (EP);
C11D1/44 (EP);
C11D1/523 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/36] | Title | German: | Detergenszusammensetzung | [1983/36] | English: | Detergent composition | [1983/36] | French: | Composition détergente | [1983/36] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/18] | 09.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.07.1987
30.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.07.1987
30.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 12.08.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.02.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.02.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 04.03.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1989/27] | CH | 08.10.1986 | |
LI | 08.10.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0026529 ; | [AD]US4235759 ; | [A]DE2350008 ; | [A]EP0026528 ; | [A]DE2648304 |