EP0089195 - Method of producing grain-oriented silicon steel sheets having excellent magnetic properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachidori 1-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachidori 1-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goto, Tomomichi 2-35, Ueno-Dori 1-chome Nada-ku Kobe City / JP | 02 /
Iwamoto, Katsuo 122, Sato Heiso-Cho Kakogawa City / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Yishinori 15. E405, Isoshi 3-chome Takaerazuka City / JP | 04 /
Matoba, Isao 1-14, Fukuzumi-Dori 8-Chome Nada-Ku Kobe City / JP | [1983/38] | Representative(s) | Overbury, Richard Douglas, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | Overbury, Richard Douglas, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301350.1 | 11.03.1983 | [1983/38] | Priority number, date | JP19820039557 | 15.03.1982 Original published format: JP 3955782 | [1983/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0089195 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0089195 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/12, C22C38/02 | [1983/38] | CPC: |
C21D8/1266 (EP,US);
C21D8/1255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1983/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von kornorientierten Siliciumstahlblechen mit ausgezeichneten magnetischen Eigenschaften | [1983/38] | English: | Method of producing grain-oriented silicon steel sheets having excellent magnetic properties | [1983/38] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de tôles d'acier au silicium à grains orientés et présentant des propriétés magnétiques excellentes | [1983/38] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/21] | 10.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54029182 ; | [A]JP56019377 ; | [A]JP56003892 ; | [A]JP57145931 ; | [X]GB999462 (UNITED STATES STEEL CORP); | [X]GB933873 (UNITED STATES STEEL CORP); | [X]US3925115 (SALSGIVER JAMES A, et al); | [A]FR2236009 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]); | [DL]EP0076109 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) | [A] - DERWENT JAPANESE PATENTS REPORT, section CH, vol. 79, no. 39, October 26, 1979, page M - 2, no. L3-M24, London, GB & JP-A-54 029 182 (NIPPON STEEL CORP. KK) 21.09.1979, & JP54029182 A 00000000 | [A] - DERWENT JAPANESE PATENTS REPORT, section CH, vol. 81, no. 20, June 21, 1981, page M - 2, no. M24-(M27), London, GB & JP-A-56 019 377 (KAWASAKI STEEL KK) 07.05.1981, & JP56019377 A 00000000 | [A] - DERWENT JAPANESE PATENTS REPORT, section CH, vol. 81, no. 5, February 27, 1981, page M - 7, no. M24-(M27), London, GB & JP-A-56 003 892 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) 27.01.1981, & JP56003892 A 00000000 | [A] - DERWENT JAPANESE PATENTS GAZETTE, section CH, week E42, December 1982, page M - 4, no. M24 (88873 E/42), London, GB & JP-A-57 145 931 (KAWASAKI STEEL KK) 09.09.1982, & JP57145931 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0047129 |