EP0090652 - A method for producing aldehydes and the industrial use of aldehydes thus-produced [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CETUS CORPORATION 1400 Fifty-Third Street Emeryville California 94608 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/05] | For all designated states CETUS CORPORATION 1400 Fifty-Third Street Emeryville California 94608 / US | ||
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states CETUS CORPORATION 600 Bancroft Way Berkeley, California 94710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geigert, John 231 Southbrook Place Clayton California / US | 02 /
Neidleman, Saul Lewis 5377 Hilltop Crescent Oakland California / US | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301775.9 | 29.03.1983 | [1983/40] | Priority number, date | US19820362746 | 29.03.1982 Original published format: US 362746 | [1983/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0090652 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0090652 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/24, // C12N9/08, C12P17/04, C12P17/12 | [1983/40] | CPC: |
C12P17/04 (EP);
C12P17/12 (EP);
C12P19/02 (EP);
C12P7/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Aldehyden und die industrielle Verwendung der dadurch erzeugten Aldehyden | [1983/40] | English: | A method for producing aldehydes and the industrial use of aldehydes thus-produced | [1983/40] | French: | Méthode de production d'aldéhydes et utilisation industrielle des aldéhydes ainsi produits | [1983/40] | File destroyed: | 09.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/21] | 01.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/17] | 05.11.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 245, no. 12, 25th June 1970, pages 3129-3134, Baltimore, US | [AD] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 245, no. 12, 25th June 1970, pages 3135-3142, Baltimore, US |