EP0091757 - Optically active 1-(6-methoxy-2-naphthyl)-2-alkoxycarbonyl)amino-1-propanone, its derivatives and their halo anlogs, and methods for their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1985 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Corner House Church Street Hamilton 5 / BM | [1984/28] |
Former [1983/42] | For all designated states SAGAMI CHEMICAL RESEARCH CENTER 4-5, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuchihashi, Genichi 14-7 Sakuragaoka 2-Chome Tama Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Mitamura, Shuichi No. 9-2 Minamidai 1-chome Sagamihara Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Kitajima, Koji No. 2882 Iijima-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Kumi No. 5-9 Shiraitodai 5-Chome Fuchu Tokyo / JP | [1983/42] | Representative(s) | Ellis, John Clifford H., et al MEWBURN ELLIS & CO. 2/3 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | Ellis, John Clifford Holgate, et al MEWBURN ELLIS & CO. 2/3 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | ||
Former [1983/42] | Armitage, Ian Michael MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301808.8 | 30.03.1983 | [1983/42] | Priority number, date | JP19820051397 | 31.03.1982 Original published format: JP 5139782 | [1983/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0091757 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C125/065, C07C93/14, // C07C59/64 | [1983/42] | CPC: |
C07C51/09 (EP,US);
C07C213/08 (KR);
A61K31/137 (KR);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07C217/60 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/09, C07C59/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/42] | Title | German: | Optisch aktives 1-(6-Methoxy-2-naphthyl)-2-(alkoxycarbonyl)amino-1-Propanon, seine Derivate, ihre Halogenanaloge und ihre Herstellungsverfahren | [1983/42] | English: | Optically active 1-(6-methoxy-2-naphthyl)-2-alkoxycarbonyl)amino-1-propanone, its derivatives and their halo anlogs, and methods for their manufacture | [1983/42] | French: | 1-(6-méthoxy-2-naphtyl)-2-(alcoxycarbonyl)amino-1-propanone optiquement actif, ses dérivés, ses analogues halogénés et leurs méthodes de préparation | [1983/42] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 24.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 23.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/28] | 16.01.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3904682 (FRIED JOHN H, et al) |