EP0091761 - Thiazolidine derivatives and production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.1988 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | For all designated states Senju Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha also known as Senju Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 6-1, Hiranomachi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states Senju Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha also known as Senju Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 6-1, Hiranomachi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka / JP | |||
Former [1983/42] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 3-6, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states Senju Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha also known as Senju Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 6-1, Hiranomachi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamatsu, Yutaka 15-3, Oharano-kamisatotorimicho Nishikyo-ku Kyoto 610-11 / JP | 02 /
Fujita, Takeshi 13-15, Nagaodai 1-chome Takarazuka Hyogo 665 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Yujiro C5-305, 1 Momoyamadai 1-chome Suita Osaka 565 / JP | [1983/42] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/42] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301847.6 | 31.03.1983 | [1983/42] | Priority number, date | JP19820062223 | 13.04.1982 Original published format: JP 6222382 | [1983/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0091761 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0091761 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0091761 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/34, // C07D277/54 | [1983/42] | CPC: |
C07D277/34 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/42] | Title | German: | Thiazolidinderivate und ihre Herstellung | [1983/42] | English: | Thiazolidine derivatives and production thereof | [1983/42] | French: | Dérivés de thiazolidine et leur préparation | [1983/42] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/16] | 26.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1222411 (SEARLE & CO); | [A]FR2100632 (RORER INC WILLIAM H); | [A]EP0033617 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) |