blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0091792

EP0091792 - Needle and suture holder and package [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.11.1988
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.11.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.12.1988 [1988/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETHICON, INC.
U.S. Route 22
Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US
[N/P]
Former [1983/42]For all designated states
ETHICON INC.
U.S. Route 22
Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Thyen, Eberhard
114 Osceola Avenue
Middlesex New Jersey / US
02 / Carr, Charles David
14 Windlow Drive
Martinsville New Jersey / US
[1983/42]
Representative(s)Jones, Alan John, et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1983/42]Jones, Alan John, et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date83301966.407.04.1983
[1983/42]
Priority number, dateUS1982036650808.04.1982         Original published format: US 366508
[1983/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0091792
Date:19.10.1983
Language:EN
[1983/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0091792
Date:24.04.1985
Language:EN
[1985/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0091792
Date:07.01.1988
Language:EN
[1988/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.1985
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/06
[1983/42]
CPC:
A61B17/06133 (EP,US); A61B2017/06142 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/42]
TitleGerman:Behälter für Nadel und Faden und zugehörige Verpackung[1983/42]
English:Needle and suture holder and package[1983/42]
French:Support et empaquetage pour aiguilles et sutures[1983/42]
Examination procedure27.09.1985Examination requested  [1985/49]
09.09.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
24.06.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.1987Fee for grant paid
20.07.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.10.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2615565  (BOWER JOHN O, et al);
 [A]FR1406513  (PARISIENNE D EXPANSION CHIMIQU);
 [A]US3217873  (GREEN BERNARD J, et al);
 [A]GB1118819  (ETHICON INC);
 [Y]FR1574869  ;
 [Y]FR2240712  (JACOTOT HERVE [CM]);
 [X]DE2618662  (STEFFAN WOLFGANG, et al);
 [A]GB2078677  (INSTRANETICS INC)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.