EP0121619 - Screw couplings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1989 [1989/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yasui, Masayuki 1537-7, Matsuoka Fuji-Shi Shizuoka-Ken / JP | For all designated states Yasui, Yasuko 1537-7, Matsuoka Fuji-Shi Shizuoka-Ken / JP | For all designated states Kamiyoshi, Yusuke 1-14 Sugano 6-Chome Ichikawa-Shi Chiba-Ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states Yasui, Masayuki 1537-7, Matsuoka Fuji-Shi Shizuoka-Ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Yasui, Yasuko 1537-7, Matsuoka Fuji-Shi Shizuoka-Ken / JP | |||
For all designated states Kamiyoshi, Yusuke 1-14 Sugano 6-Chome Ichikawa-Shi Chiba-Ken / JP | |||
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states Yasui, Masayuki 1537-7, Matsuoka Fuji-Shi Shizuoka-Ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Yasui, Yasuko 1537-7, Matsuoka Fuji-Shi Shizuoka-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasui, Masayuki 29 Kagura-Mechi 1-Chome Kuwama-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | 02 /
Yasui, Yasuko 29 Kagura-Mechi 1-Chome Kuwama-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | [1988/09] |
Former [1986/42] | 01 /
Yasui, Masayuki 29 Kagura-Mechi 1-Chome Kuwama-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | ||
02 /
Yasui, Yasuko 29 Kagura-Mechi | |||
Former [1984/42] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Evans, David Charles, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Evans, David Charles, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83301999.5 | 08.04.1983 | [1984/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0121619 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121619 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/08, F16B35/04 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
F16B35/041 (EP);
F16B37/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/42] | Title | German: | Schraubkupplungen | [1984/42] | English: | Screw couplings | [1984/42] | French: | Accouplements à vis | [1984/42] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/23] | 27.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3023797 ; | [A]US1890663 ; | [A]FR1076116 ; | [A]US3842877 ; | [A]FR2184303 |