Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0121619 | Global Dossier | 02.03.1988 | B1 | EP0121619 | 17.10.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP83301999 | 08.04.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3375818D1 | 07.04.1988 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP83301999 | 08.04.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK43589 | 07.06.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | EP83301999 | 08.04.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG13389G | 07.07.1989 | G | Priority number | Date | EP83301999 | 08.04.1983 |