EP0094172 - Control of chamber atmospheres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.1989 [1989/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The BOC Group, Inc. 85 Chestnut Ridge Road Montvale, New Jersey 07645 / US | [1984/04] |
Former [1983/46] | For all designated states AIRCO, INC. 85 Chestnut Ridge Road Montvale New Jersey 07645 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banerjee, Ratan Osaka Oxygen Industries Ltd. 3-23 4-chome Minima Tsukaguchi-cho Amagaski Hyogo 661 / JP | [1983/46] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael, et al C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | Wickham, Michael, et al c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | ||
Former [1983/46] | Wickham, Michael c/o Patent and Trademark Department BOC Limited P O Box 39 Great West House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83302370.8 | 26.04.1983 | [1983/46] | Priority number, date | US19820372600 | 28.04.1982 Original published format: US 372600 | [1983/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0094172 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0094172 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094172 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01D5/00, F26B21/14, F26B25/00 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
F26B25/006 (EP,US);
B01D5/0054 (EP,US);
F26B21/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/46] | B01D5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1983/46] | Title | German: | Kontrolle der Gaszusammensetzung einer Trockenkammer | [1983/46] | English: | Control of chamber atmospheres | [1983/46] | French: | Contrôle de l'atmosphère d'un four à chambre | [1983/46] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/26] | 11.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4150494 (ROTHCHILD RONALD D [US]); | [APD]US4337582 (SMITH STEPHEN E); | [A]US2746168 (ALBERT RICKABAUGH CHARLES); | [A]US3909953 (HEMSATH KLAUS H, et al); | [A]US4150495 (STERN NATHAN [US]); | [AP]EP0066416 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) |