EP0093579 - Process for fluorinating chlorofluoro telomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1988 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1988 [1988/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION P.O. Box 189 Niagara Falls New York 14302 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | For all designated states OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION P.O. Box 189 Niagara Falls New York 14302 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saran, Mohan S. 135 Gregory Place Grand Island New York 14072 / US | [1983/45] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1983/45] | Application number, filing date | 83302396.3 | 27.04.1983 | [1983/45] | Priority number, date | US19820374470 | 03.05.1982 Original published format: US 374470 | [1983/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0093579 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0093579 | Date: | 29.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0093579 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/20, C07C17/20, C07C19/08, // C08F14/24 | [1983/45] | CPC: |
C08F8/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Fluorierung von Chlorfluor-Telomeren | [1983/45] | English: | Process for fluorinating chlorofluoro telomers | [1983/45] | French: | Procédé pour la fluoration de chlorofluorotélomères | [1983/45] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/31] | 09.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2886607 [ ]; | GB761053 [ ]; | GB676374 [ ]; | DD139940 [ ]; | US3632834 [ ]; | DE1246703 [ ] |