Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE19528T | 15.05.1986 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP83302773 | 17.05.1983 | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4501926 | 26.02.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | US53301783 | 16.09.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4518485 | 21.05.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | US55769683 | 02.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU562743B | Global Dossier | 18.06.1987 | B2 | AU1437583 | 24.11.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0095303 | Global Dossier | 30.04.1986 | B1 | EP0095303 | 30.11.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8302598 | 17.01.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1201672 | 11.03.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3363258D1 | 05.06.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK162174C | 17.02.1992 | C | DK162174B | 23.09.1991 | B | DK220183 | 19.11.1983 | A | DK220183D0 | 17.05.1983 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8500314 | 01.10.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI72435C | 08.06.1987 | C | FI72435B | 27.02.1987 | B | FI831725L | 19.11.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR78846 | 02.10.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN157934 | 26.07.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0631335B | 27.04.1994 | B2 | JPS5936194 | 28.02.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR900005095B | 19.07.1990 | B1 | KR840004777 | 24.10.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY8700243 | 31.12.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO831716L | 21.11.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ204089 | 14.03.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH18304 | 29.05.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT76705 | 28.11.1985 | B | PT76705 | 01.06.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG77186G | 27.02.1987 | G | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4419220 | 06.12.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA833585 | 24.12.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | US37942282 | 18.05.1982 |