EP0095303 - Catalytic dewaxing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1987 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1987 [1987/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LaPierre, Rene Bernard 43 Arrowhead Court Medford New Jersey 08055 / US | 02 /
Partridge, Randall David 30 Battle Road Princetown New Jersey 08540 / US | 03 /
Chen, Nai Yuen Forrest Central Drive Titusville New Jersey 08560 / US | 04 /
Wong, Stephen Sui 138 Barnsbury Road Langhorne Pennsylvania 19047 / US | [1983/48] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | West, Alan Harry Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 83302773.3 | 17.05.1983 | [1983/48] | Priority number, date | US19820379422 | 18.05.1982 Original published format: US 379422 | [1983/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0095303 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0095303 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/64 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
C10G45/64 (EP,US);
C10G47/12 (KR);
C10G29/06 (EP,US);
Y10S208/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/48] | Title | German: | Katalytisches Entparaffinerungsverfahren | [1983/48] | English: | Catalytic dewaxing process | [1983/48] | French: | Procédé de déparaffinage catalytique | [1983/48] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/09] | 22.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Additional claims {1} | 08.01.1986 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Additional claims | Opposition(s) | 31.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1469345 [ ] (MOBIL OIL CORP); | GB2027742 [ ] (MOBIL OIL CORP); | GB1601655 [ ] (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) |