EP0095881 - A method for analyzing complex signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/49] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nasuta, Anthony Thomas 5 Hollis Court Timonium Maryland / US | 02 /
Boenning, Robert Allen 2116 Forest Ridge Timonium Maryland / US | 03 /
Kraus, Mark Gerard 1891 Beulah Road Pittsburgh Pennsylvania / US | [1983/49] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/49] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 83302958.0 | 23.05.1983 | [1983/49] | Priority number, date | US19820383447 | 01.06.1982 Original published format: US 383447 | [1983/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0095881 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0095881 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, G06F11/26, G06F15/332 | [1983/49] | CPC: |
G01R31/3193 (EP,US);
G01R31/312 (EP,US);
G01R15/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/49] | Title | German: | Methode zur Analyse komplexer Signale | [1983/49] | English: | A method for analyzing complex signals | [1983/49] | French: | Méthode pour analyser des signaux complexes | [1983/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 10.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4084136 (LIBBY HUGO L, et al) | [Y] - ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 51, no. 625, July 1979, London G. FRANGAKIS et al. "A digital Walsh function analyser", pages 89-91 | [Y] - ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 52, no. 643, October 1980, London L.B. D'ALTON "Rademacher-Walsh diagnosis", pages 83-87 | [A] - RADIOFERNSEHEN ELEKTRONIK, vol. 27, no. 7, July 1978 J. SCHULZ et al. "Digitaler Sequenzanalysator", pages 418-420 |