EP0096516 - Multi-turn inductor and LC network and method of construction thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1988 [1988/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rubertus, Roland W. Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | 02 /
Tait, William C. Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1983/51] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83303051.3 | 26.05.1983 | [1983/51] | Priority number, date | US19820385008 | 04.06.1982 Original published format: US 385008 | [1983/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096516 | Date: | 21.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096516 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/04, H01F5/00, H05K3/04 | [1983/51] | CPC: |
H01F41/041 (EP,US);
H01F41/04 (KR);
H01F5/003 (EP,US);
H03H2001/0085 (EP,US);
H03H2001/0092 (EP,US);
H05K1/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/51] | Title | German: | Induktor mit mehreren Windungen und LC Netzwerk und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1983/51] | English: | Multi-turn inductor and LC network and method of construction thereof | [1983/51] | French: | Inducteur à spires multiples et circuit LC, et son procédé de fabrication | [1983/51] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/25] | 11.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1073046 ; | [A]FR711223 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE1156131 (IBM DEUTSCHLAND); | [A]DE1226182 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US3419834 (MCKECHNIE IAN C, et al); | [A]GB1138628 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | [A]US3616039 (HUTZLER JOHN R, et al); | [A]US3913219 (LICHTBLAU GEORGE JAY); | [A]FR2412923 (OPTALIX [FR]) | [A] - Q.S.T. AMATEUR, vol. 54, no. 4, April 1970, page 44, |