EP0098054 - Wet clutch assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.01.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BORG-WARNER CORPORATION 200 South Michigan Avenue Chicago Illinois 60604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | For all designated states BORG-WARNER CORPORATION 200 South Michigan Avenue Chicago Illinois 60604 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lech, Thaddeus, Jnr. 43072 Riviera Sterling Heights Michigan 48078 / US | 02 /
Popchock, Richard Thomas 920 Hemingway Lake Orion Michigan 48035 / US | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303134.7 | 01.06.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | US19820393222 | 28.06.1982 Original published format: US 393222 | [1984/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098054 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F16D43/284, F16D25/063 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
F16D25/0635 (EP,US);
F16D43/284 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/02] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitskupplungseinheit | [1984/02] | English: | Wet clutch assembly | [1984/02] | French: | Unité d'embrayage humide | [1984/02] | File destroyed: | 04.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 18.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 21.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1987/11] | 06.10.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3243026 (SNOY JOSEPH B, et al); | [Y]FR1460372 (BORG WARNER); | [A]US3926288 (NERSTAD KARL A); | [A]FR1344137 (CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO); | [A]FR1284289 (JARMUEFEJLESZTESI INTEZET) |