EP0105574 - Floating magnetic stirrer for culture medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.1990 [1990/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techne Incorporated 3700 Brunswick Pike Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | For all designated states Techne Incorporated 3700 Brunswick Pike Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Bruyne, Norman A. 3700 Brunswick Pike Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | [1984/16] | Representative(s) | Allsop, John Rowland, et al Rowland Allsop & Co. 9 Rickamnsworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | Allsop, John Rowland, et al European Patent Attorney 10 London End Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 2JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303260.0 | 06.06.1983 | [1984/16] | Priority number, date | US19820386764 | 09.06.1982 Original published format: US 386764 | US19820432128 | 29.09.1982 Original published format: US 432128 | [1984/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0105574 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0105574 | Date: | 06.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105574 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01F13/08, B01L11/00 | [1984/16] | CPC: |
C12M23/08 (EP,US);
B01F33/452 (EP,US);
C12M23/50 (EP,US);
C12M23/56 (EP,US);
C12M27/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1988/18] |
Former [1984/16] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Schwimmender Magnetrührer für Kulturen | [1984/16] | English: | Floating magnetic stirrer for culture medium | [1984/16] | French: | Mélangeur magnétique flottant pour milieu de culture | [1984/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, IT, LU, NL, SE | 12.12.1983 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 30.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 11.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.07.1983 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 06.07.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 06.07.1983 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 06.07.1983 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 06.07.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 06.07.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 06.07.1983 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2444328 (GRUHN WOLFGANG); | [A]GB2082930 (THOMAS THOMAS RONALD); | [A]GB2054397 (TECHNE CAMBRIDGE LTD); | [A]GB2062481 (TECHNE CAMBRIDGE LTD); | [AD]US3245665 (STEEL JOHN Y); | [A]FR2452313 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP [JP]) |