EP0098691 - Fuel compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1984/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Short, Glyn David 12 Fir Tree Close Hilton Yarm Cleveland / GB | 02 /
Spencer, Michael Staines Brookdale 189 Oxbridge Lane Stockton-on-Tees Cleveland / GB | [1984/03] | Representative(s) | Gratwick, Christopher, et al Uniqema Intellectual Property Department PO Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough Clveland TS90 8JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | Gratwick, Christopher, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303288.1 | 07.06.1983 | [1984/03] | Priority number, date | GB19820017896 | 21.06.1982 Original published format: GB 8217896 | GB19820019850 | 08.07.1982 Original published format: GB 8219850 | GB19820023722 | 18.08.1982 Original published format: GB 8223722 | [1984/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0098691 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0098691 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/02 | [1984/03] | CPC: |
C10L1/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/03] | Title | German: | Brennstoffzusammensetzungen | [1984/03] | English: | Fuel compositions | [1984/03] | French: | Compositions combustibles | [1984/03] | File destroyed: | 04.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 20.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/30] | 16.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/44] | 28.05.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4380455 [ ]; | US2331386 [ ]; | EP0082688 [ ] |