EP0098695 - Improvements in or relating to multimeters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.1986 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.1986 [1986/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THORN EMI Instruments Limited Avocet House Archcliffe Road Dover Kent, CT17 9EN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | For all designated states THORN EMI Instruments Limited Avocet House Archcliffe Road Dover Kent, CT17 9EN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tedd, David Clifford 6, Godwyn Gardens Folkestone Kent / GB | 02 /
Kennedy, David Martin 12, Studfall Close Hythe Kent / GB | [1984/03] | Representative(s) | Marsh, Robin Geoffrey, et al THORN EMI Patents Limited Central Research Laboratories Dawley Road Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | Marsh, Robin Geoffrey, et al THORN EMI Patents Limited Central Research Laboratories Dawley Road Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303392.1 | 13.06.1983 | [1984/03] | Priority number, date | GB19820019252 | 02.07.1982 Original published format: GB 8219252 | [1984/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098695 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098695 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/12 | [1984/03] | CPC: |
G01R15/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/03] | Title | German: | Multimeter | [1984/03] | English: | Improvements in or relating to multimeters | [1984/03] | French: | Appareil de contrôle à usage multiple | [1984/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/29] | 15.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7028823U (TH STEINFURTH GMBH DIPL ING [DE]); | [A]DE405863 (DONALD MACADIE); | [A]US4092591 (LOZOWSKI JOSEPH F) |