EP0102150 - Data processing system with diagnosis function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koshino, Minoru c/o Fujitsu Limited Patent Department 1015 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki 211 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Yasuo c/o Fujitsu Limited Patent Department 1015 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki 211 / JP | [1984/10] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303647.8 | 24.06.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | JP19820109605 | 25.06.1982 Original published format: JP 10960582 | [1984/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0102150 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0102150 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102150 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/26, G06F11/10, G06F11/30 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
G06F11/2736 (EP,US);
G06F11/22 (KR);
G06F11/10 (EP,US);
G06F11/26 (KR);
G06F11/267 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/10] | G06F11/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/10] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungssystem mit Fehlersuchfunktion | [1984/10] | English: | Data processing system with diagnosis function | [1984/10] | French: | Système de traitement de données comprenant une fonction de diagnostic | [1984/10] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 07.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4335425 (GOTO HUMIO, et al); | [Y]US3735351 (MACHEEL G); | [A]EP0053665 (IBM [US]) | Examination | GB1403527 |