EP0129622 - Trihalomethane precursor removal using ion exchange emulsions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.06.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isacoff, Eric Gilbert 9 Juniper Drive Richboro, Pa. 18944 / US | 02 /
Neely, James Watson 504 Martin Lane Dresher, Pa. 19025 / US | [1985/01] | Representative(s) | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303714.6 | 28.06.1983 | [1985/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129622 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01J41/04, C02F1/42 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
B01J41/04 (EP);
B01J47/133 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/01] | Title | German: | Abtrennung von Trihalomethanvorläufern mittels Ionenaustauscheremulsionen | [1985/01] | English: | Trihalomethane precursor removal using ion exchange emulsions | [1985/01] | French: | Enlèvement de précurseurs de trihalométhane à l'aide d'émulsions d'échangeurs d'ions | [1985/01] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/30] | 08.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1991/14] | 22.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1991/31] | 02.06.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/14] | 15.11.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/31] | Appeal following examination | 20.07.1987 | Appeal received No. T0408/87 | 24.09.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.10.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]NL7114045 ; | [YD]US4200695 ; | [A]US4198296 ; | [A]FR1544177 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, 1980, page 366, no. 64453g, Columbus, Ohio, USA | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, 1983, page 292, no. 58615q, Columbus, Ohio, USA |