EP0099203 - Square root extractor circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.1987 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANY 1010 Common Street, P.O. Box 60035 New Orleans Louisiana 70160 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/04] | For all designated states THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANY 1010 Common Street, P.O. Box 60035 New Orleans, Louisiana 70160 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keyes, Marion A.IV 120 Riverstone Drive Chagrin Falls Ohio 44022 / US | 02 /
Thompson, William L. 15364 Gar Highway Chardon Ohio 44024 / US | [1984/04] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/04] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303725.2 | 28.06.1983 | [1984/04] | Priority number, date | US19820395429 | 06.07.1982 Original published format: US 395429 | [1984/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0099203 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0099203 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06J1/00, G06F7/68 | [1985/52] | CPC: |
G06J1/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/04] | G06J1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/04] | Title | German: | Schaltungen zur Quadratwurzelsextraktion | [1984/04] | English: | Square root extractor circuits | [1984/04] | French: | Circuits d'extraction de racine carrée | [1984/04] | File destroyed: | 04.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 13.10.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/17] | 14.11.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.08.1986 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3557348 (AEMMER PETER F); | [A]DE2410633 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) | [Y] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, vol. IM-18, no. 2, June 1969, pages 110-113, New York, US; J.A.GAGLIANOJr. et al.: "Hybrid function generator" |