EP0098732 - Improvements in or relating to de(mycinosyloxy)tylosin derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY 307 East McCarty Street Indianapolis IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY 307, East McCarty Street Indianapolis Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wild, Gene Muriel 7455, Jewel Lane Indianapolis Indiana 46250 / US | [1984/03] | Representative(s) | Crowther, Terence Roger, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | Crowther, Terence Roger, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303747.6 | 29.06.1983 | [1984/03] | Priority number, date | US19820394599 | 02.07.1982 Original published format: US 394599 | [1984/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098732 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098732 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08, C12P19/62, // (C12P19/62, C12R1:54) | [1984/03] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP,US);
C12P19/62 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12R2001/54 (EP,US);
Y10S435/896 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/03] | Title | German: | De-(Mycinosyloxy)-Tylosin-Derivate | [1984/03] | English: | Improvements in or relating to de(mycinosyloxy)tylosin derivatives | [1984/03] | French: | Dérivés de de(mycinosyloxy)tylosine | [1984/03] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 04.07.1983 | Examination requested [1984/03] | 15.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4299953 (HAMILL ROBERT L, et al); | [YD]EP0042694 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [XD]EP0052005 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) | [XP] - THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, vol. XXXVI, no. 4, 1983, pages 376-382, Japan Antibiotics Research Association, Tokyo, JP. | [D] - CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, vol. 30, no. 1, 1982, pages 97-110, Pharmaceutical Society of Japan, Tokyo, JP. | Examination | - CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, vol. 30, no. 1, 1982, pages 97-110, Pharmaceutical Society of Japan, Tokyo, JP. HAJIME MATSUBARA et al.: "Chemical transformation of tylosin, a 16-membered macrolide, and its structure-activity relationship" |