Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1638083 | Global Dossier | 05.01.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE897162 | 29.12.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE897163 | 29.12.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3323450 | 12.01.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK298983 | 31.12.1983 | A | DK298983D0 | 29.06.1983 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8500956 | 01.11.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8602019 | 01.11.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI832384L | 31.12.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2529556 | 06.01.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2543949 | 12.10.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2123415 | 01.02.1984 | A | GB8317618D0 | 03.08.1983 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR77528 | 24.09.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1173727 | 24.06.1987 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5913786 | 24.01.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5913787 | 24.01.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5913788 | 24.01.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR840005150 | 03.11.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR840005151 | 03.11.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LU84886 | 07.03.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL8302308 | 16.01.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO832375L | 02.01.1984 | L | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL242747 | 30.01.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL249795 | 04.06.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT76959 | 24.01.1986 | B | PT76959 | 01.07.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE8303728L | 30.12.1984 | L | SE8303728D0 | 29.06.1983 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA834757 | 25.04.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA834758 | 25.04.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA834759 | 29.08.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1638183 | Global Dossier | 05.01.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1637983 | Global Dossier | 05.01.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0098161 | Global Dossier | 24.04.1985 | A3 | EP0098161 | 11.01.1984 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3323462 | 12.01.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK299083 | 31.12.1983 | A | DK299083D0 | 29.06.1983 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8500957 | 01.11.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI832385L | 31.12.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2529555 | 06.01.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2123414 | 04.12.1985 | B | GB2123414 | 01.02.1984 | A | GB8317617D0 | 03.08.1983 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR77529 | 24.09.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1212876 | 30.11.1989 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | LU84887 | 07.03.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL8302309 | 16.01.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO832376L | 02.01.1984 | L | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT76960 | 24.01.1986 | B | PT76960 | 01.07.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE8303727L | 03.02.1984 | L | SE8303727D0 | 29.06.1983 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4560683 | 24.12.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8218874 | 30.06.1982 | GB8222236 | 02.08.1982 |