EP0098161 - Cephalosporin compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Clarges House 6-12 Clarges Street London W1Y 8DH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Looker, Brian Edgar 28 Middleton Avenue Greenford Middlesex / GB | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London, WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303758.3 | 29.06.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | GB19820018874 | 30.06.1982 Original published format: GB 8218874 | GB19820022236 | 02.08.1982 Original published format: GB 8222236 | [1984/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0098161 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0098161 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/24, A61K31/545 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
C07D277/587 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/02] | Title | German: | Cephalosporinderivate | [1984/02] | English: | Cephalosporin compounds | [1984/02] | French: | Composés de céphalosporine | [1984/02] | File destroyed: | 09.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 24.12.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/27] | 28.01.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.10.1985 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1604971 (HOECHST AG) |