EP0098164 - Static type semiconductor memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1989 [1989/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oritani, Atushi 37-22 Nakakibogaoka Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 214 / JP | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303761.7 | 29.06.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | JP19820111519 | 30.06.1982 Original published format: JP 11151982 | JP19820111523 | 30.06.1982 Original published format: JP 11152382 | JP19820111535 | 30.06.1982 Original published format: JP 11153582 | [1984/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0098164 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0098164 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098164 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/40 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
G11C11/418 (EP,US);
G11C7/22 (EP,US);
G11C8/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/02] | Title | German: | Statische Halbleiterspeicheranordnung | [1984/02] | English: | Static type semiconductor memory device | [1984/02] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire semi-conductrice statique | [1984/02] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 12.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5532207 ; | [Y]EP0043245 (INMOS CORP [US]); | [Y]US3859637 (PLATT STEVEN, et al); | [A]FR2184865 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]US4328558 (MUSA FUAD H, et al) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 62 (P-10)[544], 9th May 1980; & JP - A - 55 32207 (FUJITSU K.K.) 06-03-1980, & JP5532207 A 00000000 |