Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
06.11.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.1986 [1986/52] |
14.02.1986 | First examination report | |
13.02.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.04.1985 [1985/16] |
02.06.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.08.1984 [1984/31] |