EP0103365 - Refractory brick with expansion allowance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1987 [1987/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL REFRACTORIES & MINERALS CORPORATION 300 Lakeside Drive Oakland California 94643 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states NATIONAL REFRACTORIES & MINERALS CORPORATION 300 Lakeside Drive Oakland California 94643 / US | ||
Former [1984/12] | For all designated states KAISER ALUMINUM & CHEMICAL CORPORATION 865 Kaiser Building 300 Lakeside Drive Oakland California 94643 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Jim Edward 630 Happy Valley Road Pleasanton California 94566 / US | 02 /
Martinet, Jacques Rene 50 Long View Court Danville California 94526 / US | [1984/12] | Representative(s) | Oliver, Roy Edward, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/12] | Oliver, Roy Edward, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303889.6 | 04.07.1983 | [1984/12] | Priority number, date | US19820410153 | 18.08.1982 Original published format: US 410153 | [1984/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0103365 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0103365 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/04, F27B1/14, F27B7/28, F23M5/02 | [1984/12] | CPC: |
F27B7/28 (EP,US);
F23M5/02 (EP,US);
F27D1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/12] | Title | German: | Feuerfester Stein mit Ausdehnungstoleranz | [1984/12] | English: | Refractory brick with expansion allowance | [1984/12] | French: | Brique réfractaire avec tolérance de dilatation | [1984/12] | Examination procedure | 03.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/29] | 10.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT239695B (OESTERR AMERIKAN MAGNESIT); | [A]US3407788 (FRITZ HAGMANN); | [A]DE1933063 (SANDOZ AG); | [AD]US3324810 (NEELY JOSEPH E) |