EP0099230 - Polyphenylene ether resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.06.1990 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1990 | Revocation of patent | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/04] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo, 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugio, Akitoshi 382-155, Oaza Sashiohgiryo Bessho Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Masu, Masanobu 4-6-6, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Okabe, Masao 717-72, Tsukushino Abiko-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Ukita, Eiji 5-11-16, Kanamachi Katsushika-ku Tokyo / JP | [1984/04] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1984/04] | Application number, filing date | 83303917.5 | 05.07.1983 | [1984/04] | Priority number, date | JP19820116417 | 05.07.1982 Original published format: JP 11641782 | [1984/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0099230 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099230 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/20, C08K5/52, C08L71/04 | [1984/04] | CPC: |
C08K5/20 (EP,US);
C08K5/524 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/20, C08K5/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/04] | Title | German: | Polyphenylenoxidharzzusammensetzung | [1984/04] | English: | Polyphenylene ether resin composition | [1984/04] | French: | Composition de résines de poly(éther de phénylène) | [1984/04] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/21] | 21.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.10.1987
09.11.1987
ADMISSIBLE SANDOZ LTD. 35, Lichtstrasse CH-4002 Basel / CH | [1987/52] | 24.02.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.11.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.11.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 19.01.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 07.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.03.1990 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1156365 (CIBA LTD [CH]); | [A]US4003875 (LUTHI CHRISTIAN, et al) | Examination | - Taschenbuch der Kunststoff-Additive (1979), pp. 7-9, 91-93, 110 |