EP0125362 - A flexible elongated lighting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1990 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WICKES MANUFACTURING COMPANY 26261 Evergreen Road Southfield Michigan 48076 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | For all designated states WICKES MANUFACTURING COMPANY 26261 Evergreen Road Southfield Michigan 48076 / US | ||
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states Gulf & Western Manufacturing Company 26261 Evergreen Road Southfield Michigan 48076 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meggs, Daniel H. 12725 First Avenue La Mirada California 90638 / US | 02 /
Gross, Herbert G. 2317 Chandler Santa Ana California 92704 / US | 03 /
Greenslade, John T. 24641 Evereve Circle El Toro California 92630 / US | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Brereton, Paul Arthur, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | Brereton, Paul Arthur, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 83304060.3 | 13.07.1983 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | US19830495263 | 17.05.1983 Original published format: US 495263 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0125362 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125362 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F21P1/00, G08B21/00 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
F21S8/032 (EP,US);
F21S4/22 (EP,US);
G08B5/36 (EP,US);
B64D2011/0038 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
Y10S362/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/47] | Title | German: | Flexible Lichterkette | [1984/47] | English: | A flexible elongated lighting system | [1984/47] | French: | Rampe d'éclairage flexible | [1984/47] | Examination procedure | 21.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/31] | 02.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 18.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 29.09.1988 | Appeal received | 29.09.1988 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.11.1988 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1989 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4376966 (TIESZEN DWAYNE A); | [YD]US4107767 (ANQUETIN JACQUES); | [AD]US4365232 (MILLER GEORGE R); | [A]US3551723 (GRONINGEN HENRI POPKO VAN); | [A]FR2173329 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]); | [A]US3995152 (CHAO ALBERT, et al) |