EP0113948 - Pipe coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1989 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POWELL DUFFRYN TERMINALS LIMITED Powell Duffryn House 127-147 Fleet Road Fleet Hants GU13 8PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | For all designated states POWELL DUFFRYN TERMINALS LIMITED Powell Duffryn House 127-147 Fleet Road Fleet Hants GU13 8PD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Keith Anthony 23 Seymour Road Hadleigh Benfleet Essex SS7 2HB / GB | [1984/30] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 83304323.5 | 26.07.1983 | [1984/30] | Priority number, date | GB19830000730 | 12.01.1983 Original published format: GB 8300730 | [1984/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0113948 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0113948 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16L25/02 | [1984/30] | CPC: |
F16L25/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/44] |
Former [1984/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Rohrverbindung | [1984/30] | English: | Pipe coupling | [1984/30] | French: | Raccord pour tuyaux | [1984/30] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/30] | 04.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.1986 | CH | 29.10.1986 | IT | 29.10.1986 | LI | 29.10.1986 | SE | 31.10.1986 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 29.10.1986 | |
CH | 29.10.1986 | ||
IT | 29.10.1986 | ||
LI | 29.10.1986 | ||
SE | 31.10.1986 | ||
Former [1989/22] | AT | 29.10.1986 | |
CH | 29.10.1986 | ||
LI | 29.10.1986 | ||
SE | 31.10.1986 | ||
Former [1989/16] | AT | 29.10.1986 | |
SE | 31.10.1986 | ||
Former [1989/08] | AT | 29.10.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2859052 (THEOPHILE CORBEELS, et al); | [A]GB838464 (VAUXHALL MOTORS LTD); | [A]GB977133 (PIRELLI GENERAL CABLE WORKS); | [A]US3862771 (SCHWARZ WALTER) |