EP0100653 - Improved insulated-glass window [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/07] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Richard Alan 4 West View Drive Kotanoh New York 10536 / US | 02 /
Dunne, Stephen 16 Ell Scuppo Road Danbury Connecticut 06810 / US | [1984/07] | Representative(s) | McCall, John Douglas, et al WP Thompson Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | McCall, John Douglas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [1984/07] | McCall, John Douglas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 83304361.5 | 28.07.1983 | [1984/07] | Priority number, date | US19820403068 | 29.07.1982 Original published format: US 403068 | [1984/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0100653 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0100653 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/66 | [1984/07] | CPC: |
E06B3/677 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/07] | Title | German: | Isolierglasfenster | [1984/07] | English: | Improved insulated-glass window | [1984/07] | French: | Fenêtre de verre isolant | [1984/07] | File destroyed: | 04.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 03.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/46] | 10.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/15] | 08.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2208910 ; | [X]DE2918581 ; | [A]US4151690 ; | [A]DE2849898 |