EP0132467 - A control system for an electrically driven vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.1987 [1987/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bukatarevic, Dragan 22 Cheniston Gardens London, W.8 / GB | [1985/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/07] | Representative(s) | Gold, Tibor Zoltán, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | Gold, Tibor Z., et al Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 83304376.3 | 28.07.1983 | [1985/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132467 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/16, G05D1/02 | [1985/07] | CPC: |
B60K6/10 (EP);
B60L50/30 (EP);
B60W2720/10 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/07] | Title | German: | Steuerungssystem für ein elektrisch angetriebenes Fahrzeug | [1985/07] | English: | A control system for an electrically driven vehicle | [1985/07] | French: | Système de commande pour un véhicule entraîné électriquement | [1985/07] | File destroyed: | 04.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 05.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/42] | 11.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/37] | 05.03.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]GB2114387 (BUKATAREVIC D); | [AD]GB2071936 (BUKATAREVIC D); | [A]FR2374679 (PEUGEOT [FR]); | [A]EP0052263 (INVENTIO AG [CH]); | [A]BE890754 (RANSY ANTOINE F G); | [A]GB2074963 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) | [A] - ELECTRONICS, vol. 44, no. 24, 22nd November 1971, pages 89-90, New York (USA); | [A] - AUTOMOBILTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, vol. 81, no. 6, 1979, pages 283-289, Stuttgart (DE); |