blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0103395

EP0103395 - DNA sequences, recombinant DNA molecules and processes for producing bovine growth hormone-like polypeptides in high yield [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.1989
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOGEN N.V.
15 Pietermaai Willemstad
Curacao, Netherlands Antilles / NL
[N/P]
Former [1984/12]For all designated states
BIOGEN N.V.
15 Pietermaai
Willemstad Curacao, Netherlands Antilles / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Buell, Gary Nutter
4 Rue de Bonivard
CH-1201 Geneva / CH
[1984/12]
Representative(s)Bannerman, David Gardner, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1984/12]Bannerman, David Gardner, et al
Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London, EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date83304574.308.08.1983
[1984/12]
Priority number, dateGB1982002369517.08.1982         Original published format: GB 8223695
[1984/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0103395
Date:21.03.1984
Language:EN
[1984/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0103395
Date:22.05.1985
Language:EN
[1985/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.1985
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/00, C12P21/02, A23K1/165, A61K37/36, C07C103/52, // C12R1/19
[1984/12]
CPC:
C07K14/61 (EP,US); A23K20/168 (US); A61K38/00 (EP,US);
Y10S930/12 (EP,US); Y10S930/30 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/12]
TitleGerman:DNS-Sequenzen, rekombinante DNS-Moleküle und Verfahren zur Herstellung von rinderwachstumshormonähnlichen Polypeptiden, mit grosser Ausbeute[1984/12]
English:DNA sequences, recombinant DNA molecules and processes for producing bovine growth hormone-like polypeptides in high yield[1984/12]
French:Séquences d'ADN, molécules recombinantes d'ADN et procédés pour la production de peptides du genre de l'hormone de croissance bovine, avec rendement élevé[1984/12]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
File destroyed:13.07.1995
Examination procedure18.11.1985Examination requested  [1986/06]
10.09.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
06.05.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1989/37]
13.04.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1989/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.198806   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2073245  (YEDA RES & DEV);
 [A]EP0047600  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]);
 [AP]EP0075444
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.