EP0101294 - Composition for protecting and healing gastro-duodenal mucosa and the liver of mammals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California (OIPA) Wilshire Center Suite 1200 10920 Wilshire Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90024-1406 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 2199 Addison Street Berkeley, California 94720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hollander, Daniel 213 Via Dijon Newport Beach, CA 92663 / US | 02 /
Tarnawski, Andrzej Stanislaw 3108 Lincoln Way Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | [1989/14] |
Former [1984/08] | 01 /
Hollander, Daniel 213 Via Dijon Newport Beach California 92663 / US | ||
02 /
Tarnawski, Andrzej Stanislaw 3108 Lincoln Way Costa Mesa California 92626 / US | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83304607.1 | 09.08.1983 | [1984/08] | Priority number, date | US19820406558 | 09.08.1982 Original published format: US 406558 | US19830515766 | 21.07.1983 Original published format: US 515766 | [1984/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0101294 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0101294 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101294 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/20, A61K9/00, A61K47/00 | [1984/08] | CPC: |
A61K31/20 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/08] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung für den Schutz und die Heilung der Gastro-Duoden-Schleimhaut und der Leber von Säugetieren | [1984/08] | English: | Composition for protecting and healing gastro-duodenal mucosa and the liver of mammals | [1984/08] | French: | Composition pour protéger et guérir la muqueuse gastro-duodénale et le foie des mammifères | [1984/08] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 23.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3792179 (POTTS W); | [A]FR2231379 (CEPBEPE [FR]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 88, No. 21 May 22, 1978, page 555, abstract no. 152049c COLUMBUS, OHIO (US) & ZA-A-76 04 303 (SEARLE G.D. & CO.) 20-07-1977, & ZA7604303 A 00000000 |