EP0106499 - Shift register delay circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMPEX CORPORATION 401 Broadway M.S. 3-35 Redwood City California 94063-3199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | For all designated states AMPEX CORPORATION 401 Broadway M.S. 3-35 Redwood City California 94063-3199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Marshall 35900 Turpin Way Fremont California / US | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305223.6 | 07.09.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | US19820418866 | 16.09.1982 Original published format: US 418866 | [1984/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0106499 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0106499 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106499 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03H17/00 | [1984/17] | CPC: |
H03H17/0009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/17] | Title | German: | Verzögerungsanordnung mit einem Schieberegister | [1990/52] | English: | Shift register delay circuit | [1984/17] | French: | Circuit de retard avec registre de décalage | [1984/17] |
Former [1984/17] | Verzögerungsanorndnung mit einem Schieberegister | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 21.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Request for further processing for: | 01.08.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP55143825 | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 15 (E-43)[687], 29th January 1981; & JP - A - 55 143 825 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 10-11-1980, & JP55143825 A 00000000 |