EP0105646 - Fluid shear coupling apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.1990 [1990/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOUSEHOLD MANUFACTURING, INC. 2700 Sanders Road Prospect Heights Illinois 60070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | For all designated states HOUSEHOLD MANUFACTURING, INC. 2700 Sanders Road Prospect Heights Illinois 60070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bloemendaal, Brent J. 8024 Bittern Lane Indianapolis Indiana 46256 / US | [1984/16] | Representative(s) | Massey, Alexander, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [1984/16] | Application number, filing date | 83305344.0 | 13.09.1983 | [1984/16] | Priority number, date | US19820423823 | 27.09.1982 Original published format: US 423823 | [1984/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0105646 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0105646 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105646 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16D35/00 | [1984/16] | CPC: |
F16D35/022 (EP);
F16D55/00 (KR);
F16D35/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1984/16] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsreibungskupplung | [1984/16] | English: | Fluid shear coupling apparatus | [1984/16] | French: | Dispositif d'accouplement à fluide visqueux | [1984/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 03.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2087049 (AISIN SEIKI); | [XD]US4257501 (WOODS ROBERT L); | [XD]US3856122 (LEICHLITER W); | [XD]US3323623 (ROPER DANIEL W); | [XD]US3809197 (CLANCEY S); | [YD]US3191733 (WEIR THOMAS J); | [Y]US3590464 (WILDI PAUL, et al) | Examination | US4062432 | US4269295 |