EP0107338 - Displaying device for dial gauge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1986 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.05.1986 [1986/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Katayama, Ichiro No. 23-1, 2-chome, Chuo Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states Katayama, Ichiro No. 23-1, 2-chome, Chuo Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/18] | Representative(s) | Evans, David Charles, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | Evans, David Charles, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305524.7 | 20.09.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | JP19820184669 | 22.10.1982 Original published format: JP 18466982 | [1984/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0107338 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0107338 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01B3/22, G01D7/00 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
G01D7/002 (EP);
G01B3/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1984/18] | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung für eine Messuhr | [1984/18] | English: | Displaying device for dial gauge | [1984/18] | French: | Dispositif indicateur pour jauge à cadran | [1984/18] | File destroyed: | 09.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 25.02.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 05.03.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.11.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4114280 ; | [Y]EP0031716 ; | [Y]GB2064776 ; | [Y]FR2005787 ; | [A]EP0049931 ; | [A]WO8201064 |