EP0106552 - Process for preparation of zeolites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1989 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1989 [1989/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Oaza Tonda Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Oaza Tonda Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | ||
Former [1984/17] | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION No. 4560, Oaza-tonda, Shin-nanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arika, Junji 4171-7 Oaza Tokuyama Tokuyama-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Miyazaki, Hiroshi 297-156, Oaza Tonda Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Igawa, Kazushige 297-159 Oaza Tonda Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 04 /
Itabashi, Keiji 1-2-7 Kawasaki Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Bass, John Henton, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1984/17] | Application number, filing date | 83305527.0 | 20.09.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | JP19820162123 | 20.09.1982 Original published format: JP 16212382 | JP19820176077 | 08.10.1982 Original published format: JP 17607782 | [1984/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0106552 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106552 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/28 | [1984/17] | CPC: |
C01B33/2861 (EP,US);
C01B33/2869 (EP,US);
Y10S423/22 (EP,US);
Y10S423/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zeolithen | [1984/17] | English: | Process for preparation of zeolites | [1984/17] | French: | Procédé pour la production de zéolithes | [1984/17] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 26.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 16.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/50] | Request for further processing for: | 29.11.1984 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.1984 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.1985 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP57007819 [ ]; | [A]US4257885 (GROSE ROBERT W, et al); | [A]US3933974 (WINQUIST BRUCE H C); | [A]EP0016393 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al); | [A]DE2950086 (UGINE KUHLMANN); | [A]EP0002960 (FMC CORP [US]); | [A]US3119659 (TAGGART LE ROY L, et al) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 86, 30 April 1982; & JP-A-57 007 819 (Cat. D, A), & JP57007819 A 19820430 |